+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2017)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor