+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce