+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary