+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/06/2015)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2015)
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/14/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs