+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014)
On June 8, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (06/10/2014)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/20/2014)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary