+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed as amended in concurrence
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (3)
O`Neill
Type:
Primary Sponsor