+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018)
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor