+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (06/04/2014)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education