+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2018)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor