+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2014)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2014)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor