+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House passed as amended in concurrence
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2014)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance