+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Finance
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
- House passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2018)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (04/04/2018)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor