+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs