+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture