+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education