+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub B in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub B
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014)
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary