+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2018)
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary