+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Substitute A
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2013)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2013)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor