+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor