+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
- Scheduled for reconsideration (06/23/2018)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2018)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2018)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary