+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/22/2016)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016)
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/10/2016)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor