+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 4, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor