+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary