+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House passed as amended in concurrence
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/13/2014)
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/27/2014)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary