+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate read and passed
On June 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
- House passed in concurrence
On June 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services