+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2016)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/26/2016)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary