+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On August 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor