+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020)
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2020)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services