+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2014)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2014)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Corporations
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/08/2014)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2014)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/13/2014)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services