+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On July 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On July 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020)
On July 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/13/2020)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services