+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2016)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2016)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary