+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014)
- Referred to House Finance
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor