+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/31/2016)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor