+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services