+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (06/12/2014)
- Scheduled for consideration
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2014)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture