+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/13/2014)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs