+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2014)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor