+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/17/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary