+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/19/2016)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016)
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services