+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
- Committee recommended indefinite postponement
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance