+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2016)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2016)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (05/11/2016)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee heard
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture