+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2013)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/13/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs