+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/09/2016)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary