+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2014)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture