+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/11/2020)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (02/11/2020)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for Immediate Consideration
- Senate read and passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor