+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/31/2016)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/24/2016)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/17/2016)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/09/2016)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs