+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/10/2020)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services