+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020)
- House passed in concurrence
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020)
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2020)
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance