+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2016)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2016)
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2016)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/17/2016)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2016)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2016)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary