+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020)
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2020)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (02/05/2020)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs